1 | 1 | | LRB-4214/1 |
---|
2 | 2 | | CMH:wlj |
---|
3 | 3 | | 2023 - 2024 LEGISLATURE |
---|
4 | 4 | | 2023 ASSEMBLY RESOLUTIO N 20 |
---|
5 | 5 | | November 7, 2023 - Introduced by Representatives MURPHY, S. JOHNSON, BODDEN, |
---|
6 | 6 | | BRANDTJEN, DITTRICH, DONOVAN, GUNDRUM, MICHALSKI, O'CONNOR, RETTINGER |
---|
7 | 7 | | and SCHRAA. Referred to Committee on Rules. |
---|
8 | 8 | | ***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE*** |
---|
9 | 9 | | Relating to: recognizing Jerusalem as the capital of Israel. |
---|
10 | 10 | | Whereas, approximately 33,000 Wisconsin residents are of the Jewish faith; |
---|
11 | 11 | | and |
---|
12 | 12 | | Whereas, archaeological digs have uncovered Jewish heritage inside |
---|
13 | 13 | | Jerusalem and across the land of Israel dating back to at least 3,000 years ago; and |
---|
14 | 14 | | Whereas, the government of Israel retained sovereign control over the entire |
---|
15 | 15 | | city of Jerusalem on June 7, 1967; and |
---|
16 | 16 | | Whereas, from 1948 to 1967, Jerusalem was a divided city, and Israeli citizens |
---|
17 | 17 | | of all faiths as well as Jewish citizens of all states were denied access to holy sites |
---|
18 | 18 | | in the area controlled by Jordan; and |
---|
19 | 19 | | Whereas, since 1967, Jerusalem has been a united city administered by Israel, |
---|
20 | 20 | | and persons of all religious faiths have been guaranteed full access to holy sites |
---|
21 | 21 | | within the city; and |
---|
22 | 22 | | Whereas, Jerusalem is the residence of the Knesset, the Supreme Court of |
---|
23 | 23 | | Israel, the prime minister of Israel, the National Bank, and other federal |
---|
24 | 24 | | 1 |
---|
25 | 25 | | 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | 3 |
---|
27 | 27 | | 4 |
---|
28 | 28 | | 5 |
---|
29 | 29 | | 6 |
---|
30 | 30 | | 7 |
---|
31 | 31 | | 8 |
---|
32 | 32 | | 9 |
---|
33 | 33 | | 10 |
---|
34 | 34 | | 11 |
---|
35 | 35 | | 12 |
---|
36 | 36 | | 13 |
---|
37 | 37 | | 14 |
---|
38 | 38 | | 15 - 2 -2023 - 2024 Legislature |
---|
39 | 39 | | LRB-4214/1 |
---|
40 | 40 | | CMH:wlj |
---|
41 | 41 | | government buildings, and recognizing Jerusalem as the capital of the State of Israel |
---|
42 | 42 | | would provide for efficacy of diplomacy; and |
---|
43 | 43 | | Whereas, each sovereign nation under international law and custom may |
---|
44 | 44 | | designate its own capital, and the United States maintains its embassy in the |
---|
45 | 45 | | functioning capital of every country except in the case of our democratic friend and |
---|
46 | 46 | | strategic ally, the State of Israel; and |
---|
47 | 47 | | Whereas, on October 24, 1995, the 104th United States Congress passed the |
---|
48 | 48 | | bipartisan Jerusalem Embassy Act of 1995, which was overwhelmingly adopted by |
---|
49 | 49 | | the Senate (93-5) and the House of Representatives (374-37), and which recognized |
---|
50 | 50 | | Jerusalem as the capital of Israel and ordered the relocation of the U.S. embassy to |
---|
51 | 51 | | Jerusalem by no later than May 31, 1999; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | Whereas, on June 5, 2017, Senate Resolution 167, relating to the recognition |
---|
53 | 53 | | of Jerusalem as the capital of Israel and the relocation of the U.S. embassy to |
---|
54 | 54 | | Jerusalem, passed by a unanimous 90-0 vote; and |
---|
55 | 55 | | Whereas, on December 6, 2017, the president of the United States officially |
---|
56 | 56 | | recognized Jerusalem as the capital of the State of Israel; now, therefore, be it |
---|
57 | 57 | | Resolved by the assembly, That the Wisconsin State Assembly, in adopting |
---|
58 | 58 | | this resolution, honors this auspicious occasion and formally recognizes the city of |
---|
59 | 59 | | Jerusalem as the official capital of the State of Israel; and, be it further |
---|
60 | 60 | | Resolved, That the assembly chief clerk transmit authenticated copies of this |
---|
61 | 61 | | resolution to the news media of Wisconsin, to the president of the United States, to |
---|
62 | 62 | | the Speaker and the clerk of the United States House of Representatives, to the |
---|
63 | 63 | | president and the secretary of the United States Senate, to the chancellor of the |
---|
64 | 64 | | University of Wisconsin–Madison and each of the members of the Board of Regents, |
---|
65 | 65 | | to the provosts and chairpersons of the boards of trustees of all Wisconsin public and |
---|
66 | 66 | | 1 |
---|
67 | 67 | | 2 |
---|
68 | 68 | | 3 |
---|
69 | 69 | | 4 |
---|
70 | 70 | | 5 |
---|
71 | 71 | | 6 |
---|
72 | 72 | | 7 |
---|
73 | 73 | | 8 |
---|
74 | 74 | | 9 |
---|
75 | 75 | | 10 |
---|
76 | 76 | | 11 |
---|
77 | 77 | | 12 |
---|
78 | 78 | | 13 |
---|
79 | 79 | | 14 |
---|
80 | 80 | | 15 |
---|
81 | 81 | | 16 |
---|
82 | 82 | | 17 |
---|
83 | 83 | | 18 |
---|
84 | 84 | | 19 |
---|
85 | 85 | | 20 |
---|
86 | 86 | | 21 |
---|
87 | 87 | | 22 |
---|
88 | 88 | | 23 |
---|
89 | 89 | | 24 |
---|
90 | 90 | | 25 - 3 -2023 - 2024 Legislature |
---|
91 | 91 | | LRB-4214/1 |
---|
92 | 92 | | CMH:wlj |
---|
93 | 93 | | private colleges and universities, and to the Israeli Embassy in Washington, D.C., |
---|
94 | 94 | | for transmission to the proper authorities in the State of Israel. |
---|
95 | 95 | | (END) |
---|
96 | 96 | | 1 |
---|
97 | 97 | | 2 |
---|
98 | 98 | | 3 |
---|