House | 03/14/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on calendar 3-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduced |