Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AR8 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 LRB-2018/1
22 RAC:klm&wlj
33 2023 - 2024 LEGISLATURE
44 2023 ASSEMBLY RESOLUTIO N 8
55 April 28, 2023 - Introduced by Representatives SINICKI, CLANCY, C. ANDERSON, J.
66 ANDERSON, ANDRACA, CABRERA, CONLEY, DRAKE, BALDEH, EMERSON, JOERS,
77 MADISON, MOORE OMOKUNDE, SHELTON, SUBECK, SHANKLAND and ORTIZ-VELEZ.
88 Referred to Committee on Rules.
99 ***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE***
1010 Relating to: commemorating the date of the Bay View labor strike and tragedy and
1111 requiring the permanent removal of the portrait of Jeremiah Rusk from public
1212 display in the assembly parlor and instead requiring that a portrait of former
1313 Governor Tommy G. Thompson be hung in the assembly parlor.
1414 Whereas, Wisconsin workers and reformers have long made important
1515 contributions in the history of labor in the United States, having helped enact new
1616 state laws early in the 20th century, such as Worker's Compensation and
1717 Unemployment Insurance, that, in turn, were adopted by other states and the
1818 federal government; and
1919 Whereas, decades earlier, in the late 1800s, workers were still struggling to
2020 attain basic rights in the workplace, and still generally labored at physically
2121 punishing jobs for 10 to 12 hours per day, six days per week; and
2222 Whereas, in the 1880s, workers in Milwaukee, like others in Chicago and across
2323 the country, began to advocate for the eight-hour workday, an early cornerstone of
2424 the basic bill of rights of all people in the workplace; and
2525 1
2626 2
2727 3
2828 4
2929 5
3030 6
3131 7
3232 8
3333 9
3434 10
3535 11
3636 12
3737 13
3838 14
3939 15 - 2 -2023 - 2024 Legislature
4040 LRB-2018/1
4141 RAC:klm&wlj
4242 Whereas, facing no apparent efforts toward this reform on the part of
4343 employers, workers' organizations across the nation eventually called upon all
4444 workers to cease their labor if employers had not adopted a standard eight-hour
4545 workday by May 1, 1886; and
4646 Whereas, in Milwaukee, civil parades and demonstrations developed over the
4747 first five days of May 1886, as workers peaceably and without violence joined the
4848 national work stoppage to protest and abolish inhumane work hours; and
4949 Whereas, on May 2, 1886, there was a huge Eight-Hour Day Parade in which
5050 many German and Polish workers and their families walked to the picnic grounds,
5151 and on May 3, 1886, thousands of workers from the breweries and the building trades
5252 went on strikes and marched from factory to factory; and
5353 Whereas, by May 5, 1886, unrest among Milwaukee's laborers over the struggle
5454 for better work hours had led to more than a dozen strikes in the city, involving
5555 carpenters, coal heavers, sewer diggers, iron moulders, teamsters, common laborers,
5656 and other workers asking for humane work hours; and
5757 Whereas, the last grand factory in Milwaukee still in operation that day was
5858 the North Chicago Rolling Mill, in Bay View, which manufactured rails for the
5959 nation's railroads; and
6060 Whereas, on May 5, 1886, despite the threat of violence from the state militia,
6161 a crowd of striking workers started to walk, peaceably and unarmed, to the Rolling
6262 Mill to enjoin the workers there, known as iron puddlers, to participate in the general
6363 strike; and
6464 Whereas, despite the law-abiding nature of their procession, this group of
6565 walking laborers was fired upon by the state militia upon direct orders from
6666 1
6767 2
6868 3
6969 4
7070 5
7171 6
7272 7
7373 8
7474 9
7575 10
7676 11
7777 12
7878 13
7979 14
8080 15
8181 16
8282 17
8383 18
8484 19
8585 20
8686 21
8787 22
8888 23
8989 24 - 3 -2023 - 2024 Legislature
9090 LRB-2018/1
9191 RAC:klm&wlj
9292 Governor Jeremiah Rusk to do so, killing seven people and wounding four, including
9393 innocent bystanders; and
9494 Whereas, some 50 of those workers who marched that day and were fired upon
9595 were indicted on charges of rioting and conspiracy for merely exercising their right
9696 of freedom to assemble, and three of them eventually served six to nine months in
9797 prison; and
9898 Whereas, the infamous events of May 5, 1886, will remain a part of Wisconsin's
9999 cultural and economic legacy forever, and should remind us in the present to honor
100100 the sacrifices our forebears made, including laying down their lives, so that all those
101101 who labor might lead safer and more productive work lives; and
102102 Whereas, the citizens of Bay View and Milwaukee commemorate this pivotal
103103 series of events annually on the first Sunday of May at the site of the Bay View
104104 Rolling Mill Historic Marker at S. Superior Street and E. Russell Avenue in
105105 Milwaukee; now, therefore, be it
106106 Resolved by the assembly, That to commemorate the Bay View strike and
107107 tragedy and the sad fact of deadly opposition used by then Governor Jeremiah Rusk,
108108 the assembly chief clerk shall permanently remove the portrait of Jeremiah Rusk
109109 that hangs in the assembly parlor from all public display and shall hang in its place
110110 a portrait of former Governor Tommy G. Thompson, for whom the assembly parlor
111111 is named.
112112 (END)
113113 1
114114 2
115115 3
116116 4
117117 5
118118 6
119119 7
120120 8
121121 9
122122 10
123123 11
124124 12
125125 13
126126 14
127127 15
128128 16
129129 17
130130 18
131131 19
132132 20
133133 21