Senate
|
08/07/2023
|
Published 8-5-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 8-4-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 29
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 8-2-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Representatives Sapik and Dittrich added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 28, Noes 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|