Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Senate Bill SB1014 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: February 21, 2024 	Contact: Steve McCarthy, Senior Staff Attorney 
2023 Senate Bill 1014 Senate Substitute Amendment 1 
2023 SENATE BILL 1014 
The bill provides that the Department of Health Services (DHS) may submit to the Joint Committee on 
Finance (JCF) a request for funding in the 2023-25 fiscal biennium, in a total amount not exceeding $15 
million to award grants to fund one or more health systems that apply for a grant and both commit to 
providing hospital emergency department services in Chippewa County or Eau Claire County, and agree 
to use any grant moneys received to fund capital expenditures to aid in providing hospital emergency 
department services in Chippewa County or Eau Claire County. 
The bill requires that DHS must both include in its request for funding a plan that identifies each health 
system that requests funding, describes the types of capital expenditures for which the requested 
funding would be used, and prioritize grant awards to support hospital emergency department services 
in Chippewa County. JCF may then approve the plan and request for funding, as proposed or as 
modified. 
The bill also provides that, upon approval of DHS’ plan, JCF may supplement a DHS appropriation for 
the grant program from its general program supplementation appropriation account in an amount 
determined by JCF, but not exceeding a total of $15 million, to provide grants to health systems as 
provided in the approved plan. 
Lastly, the bill provides that, by March 1, 2025, a health system that receives a grant must report to 
DHS the amount of funding received, a detailed description of all capital expenditures for which the 
funding was used, and the impact of the funding on the health system’s hospital emergency department 
services. Then, by June 1, 2025, DHS must submit a report to the Legislature summarizing this 
information received from the grant recipients. 
SENATE SUBSTITUTE AMENDMENT 1 
The substitute amendment removes JCF involvement in the grant program. Instead, the substitute 
amendment provides that DHS must award grants in an amount up to $15 million to fund one or more 
health systems that apply for a grant and both commit to providing hospital emergency department 
services in Chippewa County or Eau Claire County, and agree to use any grant moneys received to fund 
capital expenditures to aid in providing hospital emergency department services in Chippewa County or 
Eau Claire County. 
The substitute amendment still requires DHS to prioritize grant awards to support hospital emergency 
department services in Chippewa County, and retains the reporting requirements described above.  - 2 - 
BILL HISTORY 
Senator James offered Senate Substitute Amendment 1 on February 19, 2024. On February 20, 2024, 
the Senate adopted the substitute amendment on a voice vote and passed the bill, as amended, on a vote 
of Ayes, 20; Noes, 12. 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
SM:ksm