Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/22/2023 | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Representatives Joers, Palmeri, Bare, Steffen and Rettinger added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Representative Riemer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Introduced |