Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Senator Wirch added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Senator Agard added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Introduced |