LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Wisconsin WI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB103
Action History
WI
Wisconsin Senate Bill SB103
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SB103
Action History
Senate
04/15/2024
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Senate
06/14/2023
Representatives Cabrera, C. Anderson and Haywood added as cosponsors
Senate
06/13/2023
Representative Joers added as a cosponsor
Senate
05/17/2023
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen
Senate
03/01/2023
Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection
Senate
03/01/2023
Introduced