Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tomczyk | ||
Senate | 07/10/2023 | Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and rereferred to committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Representative Baldeh withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tomczyk | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Representative Ratcliff withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Introduced |