Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senator Hutton added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Introduced |