House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Representative Schutt added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Representative J. Anderson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Representatives Myers, S. Johnson, Palmeri and Brooks added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Representative Melotik added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2023
|
Representative Neylon added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Representatives C. Anderson and Considine added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance and Small Business, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Senator Wirch added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Representative Clancy added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senator Agard added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Representative Bare added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Representatives Shelton and Hong added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Small Business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|