Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Representative J. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Senator Wirch added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Representatives Penterman and Tittl added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Senators Marklein and Carpenter added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Introduced |