House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Representative Moses added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on calendar 4-19-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|