Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Representative Nedweski added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Representatives Joers and J. Anderson added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Introduced |