Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Jacque
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 4, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2023
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2023
|
Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Representative Melotik added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2023
|
Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Donovan added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senator Roys added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Representative Gundrum added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Representative Madison added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|