House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Representative Magnafici added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Representative Riemer added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senator Agard added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|