Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Representatives Cabrera and O'Connor added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 07/03/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Introduced |