House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in as amended
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Representatives Cabrera, Drake and Rozar added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Oldenburg
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Representative Billings added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senator Cowles added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|