House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 22, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Senator Roys withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|