Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Representative Bare added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Introduced |