Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Senator Agard added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Introduced |