Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 10/06/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/06/2023 | Report passage by Committee on Health, Ayes 2, Noes 4 | ||
Senate | 10/04/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Introduced |