Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Representative Shelton added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Representative Considine added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Introduced |