Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Representative Melotik added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 09/13/2023 | Representative Macco added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/24/2023 | Representative Penterman withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Representative Rettinger added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Introduced |