Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Representative Considine added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Introduced |