House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 12/01/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 12/01/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 12/01/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 11/30/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Representatives Madison and Clancy added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Introduced |