Senate | 03/26/2024 | Published 3-23-2024 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 174 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read a third time and concurred in | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Read a third time and passed | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 11/03/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Introduced |