Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Action ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Summerfield
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Housing report received pursuant to s. 13.099 (2) Wisconsin Statutes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|