Wisconsin Legislative Council AMENDMENT MEMO One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc Memo published: February 15, 2024 Contact: Ethan Lauer, Senior Staff Attorney Anna Henning, Principal Attorney 2023 Senate Bill 187 Assembly Amendment 1 2023 SENATE BILL 187 In certain circumstances, cities, villages, towns, and counties may inspect and examine plans for commercial buildings and equipment on behalf of the Department of Safety and Professional Services (DSPS). In relevant part, 2023 Senate Bill 187 requires DSPS to prepare a plan for encouraging cities, villages, towns, and counties to inspect and examine plans for commercial buildings and equipment, and for increasing support provided to those local governments. Under the bill, DSPS must submit the plan to the Legislature by January 1, 2024. ASSEMBLY AMENDMENT 1 Assembly Amendment 1 delays until January 1, 2025 the deadline for DSPS to submit the plan to the Legislature. BILL HISTORY Representative Summerfield offered Assembly Amendment 1 on February 12, 2024. On February 13, 2024, the Assembly adopted the amendment and passed the bill, as amended, each on a voice vote. For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. EL:AH:jal