Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Housing report received pursuant to s. 13.099 (2) Wisconsin Statutes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|