Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Representative Gundrum added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Representative Bodden added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Introduced |