Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senator Stafsholt added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Representatives Binsfeld and Michalski added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Representative Swearingen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Introduced |