Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Senator Agard added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Representative Bare added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator James | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Introduced |