House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Read a third time and passed | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Introduced |