Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Senator Larson added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 08/28/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Introduced |