Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Introduced |