Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Introduced |