Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Published 4-4-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 265
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:10 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2023
|
Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Representative Hong added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Representatives Joers and Billings added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|