Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Referred to committee on Administrative Rules, Ayes 22, Noes 11 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s. 227.26(2)(g), Wisconsin Statutes | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26 (2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Administrative Rules | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Introduced |