House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 3 | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 09/12/2023 | Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | ||
Senate | 09/06/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 08/23/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Introduced |