House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Placed on the foot of the 14th order of business on the calendar of 11-14-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2023
|
Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cowles
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|