Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 12/14/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 12/14/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 12/14/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator James | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |