Senate | 03/14/2024 | Published 3-15-2024 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Report approved by the Governor on 3-14-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 111 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Presented to the Governor on 3-11-2024 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read a third time and concurred in | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:12 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Read a third time and passed | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |