House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 4, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 4, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/28/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Jacque
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Representative Bodden added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/02/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2023
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2023
|
Senator Knodl added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Representative Allen added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|