Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 07/10/2023 | Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and rereferred to committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Representative Kurtz added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Representative Neylon added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Representative Rozar added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Introduced |