Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Published 3-23-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 190
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Representative Moses added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Representatives Emerson and Gustafson added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Placed on the foot of the 14th order of business on the calendar of 11-14-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and rereferred to committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Representatives Madison and Clancy added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|