Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/01/2023 | Senator Agard added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 08/22/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Representative Rettinger added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Representative Green withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Introduced |