Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn | ||
Senate | 09/13/2023 | LRB correction | ||
Senate | 08/21/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 08/17/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 08/02/2023 | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Quinn | ||
Senate | 07/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/29/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Senator Felzkowski added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Senator Ballweg added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Introduced |