Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Published 12-7-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 73
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2023
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2023
|
LRB correction (Senate Amendment 2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2023
|
LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 88, Noes 10
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Representative C. Anderson withdrawn as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senator Cowles withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Passed, Ayes 21, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Refused to refer to committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 13, Noes 20
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading, Ayes 25, Noes 8
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 adopted, Ayes 19, Noes 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 6 to Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 5 to Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 4 to Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 3 to Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 17, Noes 16
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 6 to Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Spreitzer
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 5 to Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Spreitzer
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 4 to Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Spreitzer
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 18, Noes 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Decision of the Chair does not stand as the judgment of the Senate, Ayes 14, Noes 19
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Point of order that Senate Amendment 2 was not germane well taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 3 to Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Hutton and Spreitzer
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Hutton and Spreitzer
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Hutton and Spreitzer
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator LeMahieu
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Placed on the foot of the 14th order of business on the calendar of 11-14-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|