Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2023
|
Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2023
|
Representative Drake added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2023
|
Representative Hong added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2023
|
Representative Billings added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|